Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio (Tullio) del Carretto

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1594AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
25 Jul 1594Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
13 Oct 1614DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio (Tullio) del Carretto (VIAF: 88840513)
Bishop Giulio (Tullio) del Carretto (died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Ordained BishopMoniales S. Dominique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 137
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast