Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Goffredo Ginod

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1586AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
14 Dec 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
26 Feb 1592DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Goffredo Ginod
Bishop Giovanni Goffredo Ginod (died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavoia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Belley, Diocese of Belley, France
Death PlaceAosta, Diocese of Aosta

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast