Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manoel Joaquim da Silveira

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1807Born
8 Jun 182922.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 May 183023.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 185144.1SelectedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
5 Sep 185144.4ConfirmedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
25 Jan 185244.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
5 Feb 186153.8SelectedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
18 Mar 186153.9ConfirmedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
23 Jun 187467.1DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel Joaquim da Silveira
Archbishop Manoel Joaquim da Silveira (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 352, and Page 495
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast