Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Vincenzo Andrea Maria Dania, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1744Born
23 Aug 176722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Dec 180258.2AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
21 Dec 180258.2Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
6 Sep 181873.9DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Vincenzo Andrea Maria Dania
Bishop Angelo Vincenzo Andrea Maria Dania O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVoltri

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 71
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast