Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Agrippa Dandini

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹Born
2 Aug 159941.6AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
22 Aug 159941.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
20 Oct 1603³45.8DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Agrippa Dandini:
Bishop Marco Agrippa Dandini (died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 71
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 36, Number 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013