Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuliano Castagnola

Deceased

Bishop of Nebbio


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1612AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
30 Nov 1612Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
27 Nov 1620DiedBishop of Nebbio, France

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Castagnola:
Bishop Giuliano Castagnola (died ) Bishop of Nebbio

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 255
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 53, Number 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013