Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Crespo y Monroy, O.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1673¹BornCordovilla, Spain
9 Oct 172249.7AppointedBishop of Durango, México
21 Dec 172350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
15 Oct 173360.7SelectedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
20 Jan 173461.0ConfirmedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
24 Oct 173461.8InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
19 Jul 173764.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Crespo y Monroy:
Bishop Benito Crespo y Monroy O.S. (born 1673, died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 41, Number 154
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015