Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Craveri, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1726Born
23 Dec 177953.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Smirne, Turkey
17 Aug 178155.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Smirne, Turkey
30 Sep 178357.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aenus
12 Oct 178357.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aenus
19 Dec 178559.3AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
19 Mar 178861.6SelectedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
7 Apr 178861.6ConfirmedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
7 Oct 180175.1DiedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Craveri
Bishop Pietro Antonio Craveri O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoretta

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68, and Page 164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 223, and Page 383
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,701
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 4 Mar 2018