Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Corbi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Ionopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1778BornNapoli
1 May 180123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
30 Sep 183355.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
30 Sep 183355.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ionopolis
24 Nov 183355.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ionopolis

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Corbi
Bishop Ferdinand Corbi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 224
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Aug 2016