Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Copis

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Oct 1522AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
28 Dec 1522Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
15 Aug 1527DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Copis
Bishop Giovanni de Copis (died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1522, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast