Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Ramírez de Villaescua de Haro

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1459Born
14 Feb 149838.1AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
7 Feb 150040.1AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
12 Apr 151858.3AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
11 Aug 153777.6DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Ramírez de Villaescua de Haro (VIAF: 14951728)
Bishop Diego Ramírez de Villaescua de Haro (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 6*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98, and Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 233, and Page 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Apr 2018