Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Ghinucci {Ginucci}

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Administrator of Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1480¹Born
16 Oct 151232.7AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
30 Jul 151838.5ResignedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
26 Sep 152242.7AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 152343.6AppointedAdministrator of Malta
21 May 153555.3Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 153555.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
25 Jan 153757.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
6 Jul 153757.5AppointedAdministrator of Cavaillon, France
20 Mar 153858.2ResignedAdministrator of Malta
14 Jun 153858.4AppointedAdministrator of Tropea, Italy
16 Jul 154060.5ResignedAdministrator of Cavaillon, France
3 Jul 154161.5DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Ghinucci {Ginucci} (VIAF: 311416445)
Girolamo Cardinal Ghinucci {Ginucci} (born 1480, died ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 May 1535
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 320, and Page 161
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 334, and Page 244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 119
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 62
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 98
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1512, Number 25*
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1522, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast