Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Chumer (Chumberg), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598BornGrgar
16 Apr 163941.3SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
3 Oct 163941.8ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
3 Oct 163941.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
8 Jan 164042.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
30 Jun 165153.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Michael Chumer (Chumberg):
Bishop Michael Chumer (Chumberg) O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 150
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 104, Number 631

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013