Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Philippe Giraudeau, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tatsienlu, China

Titular Bishop of Thynias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1850Born
29 Jun 187626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
9 Aug 187727.3ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Feb 189746.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
15 Feb 189746.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thynias
12 Dec 189747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thynias
9 Sep 190151.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Thibet, China
9 Aug 193686.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tatsienlu, China
13 Nov 194191.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tatsienlu, China

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Philippe Giraudeau (VIAF: 24455963)
Bishop Pierre-Philippe Giraudeau M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tatsienlu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Mars-de-Coutais, France

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 552
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017