Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Capece

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1774BornTempio
15 Oct 1798³24.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 183358.8SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
15 Apr 183358.9ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
14 Jul 183359.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
7 Sep 185581.3DiedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Capece:
Bishop Diego Capece (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Tempio

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013