Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurizio Centini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornAscoli
9 Feb 162634.1AppointedBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
Mar 1626²34.1Ordained BishopBishop of Massa Lubrense, Italy
12 May 163139.3AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
14 Nov 163947.8DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Centini:
Bishop Maurizio Centini O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 234, and Page 242
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015