Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico da Settla (Septala)

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1213AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Jul 1219²Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
16 Sep 1230DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico da Settla (Septala):
Archbishop Enrico da Settla (Septala) (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013