Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thomas Cardinal Olivier

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1170¹Born
23 Mar 122353.2SelectedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
7 Apr 122555.2ConfirmedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Sep 122555.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
28 Sep 122555.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Sep 122757.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Olivier
Thomas Cardinal Olivier (born 1170, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestfalen (or Friesland)

  • a cardinal for 1.9 years
  • Principal Consecrator:
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Sep 1225
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,027

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast