Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Filangeri

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1195²Born
Dec 1226³31.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 122631.9AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
Mar 1227³32.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
6 Jul 125156.5DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Filangeri
Archbishop Mariano Filangeri (born 1195, died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera, Diocese of Nocera de’ Pagani
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast