Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Durazzo

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1633BornGenoa, Italy
4 May 167138.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
2 Sep 168653.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 168754.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Carpentras, France
14 Nov 168956.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
27 Nov 169057.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ferrara, Italy
27 Aug 169158.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Spoleto, Italy
7 Feb 169561.9ResignedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
11 Nov 169764.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faenza, Italy
21 Feb 170168.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
27 Apr 171077.1DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Durazzo:
Marcello Cardinal Durazzo (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a cardinal for 23.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Sep 2014