Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José González Blázquez, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630BornEscurial
31 May 168858.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
24 Jan 169565.1AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
9 Dec 169868.9DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for José González Blázquez:
Bishop José González Blázquez O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 159, and Page 316
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 230, Number 1,431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013