Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Candido

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹Born
13 Nov 160640.9AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
19 Nov 160640.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
Aug 160842.6DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Candido:
Bishop Giacomo Candido Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 215
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 43, Number 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013