Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Campani (Capanus)

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1603AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
20 Apr 1603Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
15 Jun 1605DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Campani (Capanus):
Bishop Fabrizio Campani (Capanus) (died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 185
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 39, Number 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015