Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Basile Cacace, C.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ravenna

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1624AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ravenna, Italy
12 Feb 1624AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
25 Feb 1624Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
27 Apr 1646DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Basile Cacace:
Archbishop Basile Cacace C.R. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 183
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 83, Number 495
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013