Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Brivio

Deceased

Bishop of Cremona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jul 1610AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
5 Sep 1610Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
2 Feb 1621DiedBishop of Cremona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Brivio
Bishop Giambattista Brivio (died ) Bishop of Cremona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 167
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 48, Number 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast