Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Franciscus Ladislaus Mednyánszky

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Leuce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1678BornPresbourg
9 Aug 170022.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Sep 173153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Leuce
2 Dec 173153.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leuce
6 Dec 173355.3DiedTitular Bishop of Leuce

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Franciscus Ladislaus Mednyánszky:
Bishop Ignatius Franciscus Ladislaus Mednyánszky (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Leuce

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015