Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Xaver Marotti

Deceased

Bishop of Pedena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1683³BornRijeka
14 Jun 170724.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Pedena, Austria
18 Jun 170724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pedena, Austria
8 Feb 171329.8SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Pedena, Austria
22 May 171330.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Pedena, Austria
22 May 171330.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
6 Jun 171330.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
25 Apr 171633.0SucceededBishop of Pedena, Austria
20 Aug 174057.3DiedBishop of Pedena, Austria

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Xaver Marotti:
Bishop Georg Xaver Marotti (born , died ) Bishop of Pedena

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182, and Page 311
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 4 Jul 2015