Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Okolicsany

Deceased

Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1675BornTeplae
22 Aug 170025.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 173559.9AppointedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
20 Nov 173661.7DiedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

MicroData Summary for János Okolicsany:
Bishop János Okolicsany (born , died ) Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}

  • a priest for 36.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013