Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Casimiro Rossi Reyna, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Capsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1681Born
26 Feb 170423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
23 Mar 172948.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsus
11 Sep 172948.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capsus
22 Feb 176180.0DiedTitular Bishop of Capsus

MicroData Summary for Casimiro Rossi Reyna
Bishop Casimiro Rossi Reyna O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Capsus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Duomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,470
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 141
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 Mar 2014
  • d: CB, 5 Mar 2014
  • d: CB, 20 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,037
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 28
  • loc: AT, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast