Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Borzi

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Apostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1750¹Born
23 Apr 178737.3AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
8 Jul 178737.5Ordained BishopBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
11 Apr 179141.2AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
27 Sep 179141.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
11 Feb 182373.1DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Borzi
Archbishop Francesco Borzi (born 1750, died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ, Diocese of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
Ordained BishopSte Madeleine Zaruffensi, Church, Skolpje

  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86, and Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 370
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1787, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,679

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast