Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lekė Summa

Deceased

Bishop of Sapė, Albania


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Dec 1820AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
22 Jul 1821Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
23 Dec 1826DiedBishop of Sapė, Albania

MicroData Summary for Lekė Summa
Bishop Lekė Summa (died ) Bishop of Sapė

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 334
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1821, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast