Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gjon Logorezzi (Logoreci)

Deceased

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1727¹Born
2 Apr 178154.2AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
26 Sep 179164.7AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
21 Dec 179467.9DiedBishop of Sapë, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gjon Logorezzi (Logoreci)
Bishop Gjon Logorezzi (Logoreci) (born 1727, died ) Bishop of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrë

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 349, and Page 367
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast