Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Dodmassei

Deceased

Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jul 1808AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
6 Nov 1808Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
19 Dec 1814AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
21 Jul 1816DiedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

MicroData Summary for Antonio Dodmassei:
Bishop Antonio Dodmassei (died ) Bishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 315, and Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013