Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gjergj EngjŽll Radovani

Deceased

Archbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Apostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1734¹Born
30 Apr 176733.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
29 Jul 177137.5AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
23 Apr 178753.3AppointedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro
27 Apr 178753.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Budua (Budva), Montenegro
15 Nov 179056.8DiedArchbishop of Bar (Antivari), Montenegro

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gjergj EngjŽll Radovani
Archbishop Gjergj EngjŽll Radovani (born 1734, died ) Archbishop of Bar (Antivari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrŽ

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86, and Page 133
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 370, and Page 384
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1771, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast