Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Gazotti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Dec 1303AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
21 Aug 1322AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
3 Aug 1323DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Augustin Gazotti
Bishop Augustin Gazotti O.P. (died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 537, and Page 315
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 23 Dec 2020

Quantcast