Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Rodríguez

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1300AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
12 Jul 1300Ordained BishopBishop of Burgos, Spain
15 Dec 1302AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
15 Dec 1302Elevated to Cardinal
22 Dec 1302AppointedAdministrator of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
1310²ResignedAdministrator of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Dec 1310DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rodríguez:
Pedro Cardinal Rodríguez (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a bishop for 10.4 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Dec 1302
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 299, Number 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014