Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Blondy

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1245AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
22 Oct 1245Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 1257DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Blondy:
Bishop Richard Blondy (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013