Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godefroid-Udalric de La Margelle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1635³Born
24 Jan 166125.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roermond, Netherlands
25 Jan 166125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
3 Dec 169661.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Dec 169661.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
27 Jan 169761.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Armenia
May 1703³67.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Godefroid-Udalric de La Margelle
Bishop Godefroid-Udalric de La Margelle (born , died May 1703) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEysden

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast