Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenz von Bibra

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1459Born
12 May 149536.3SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
10 Jul 149536.5ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
11 Oct 149536.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
6 Feb 151960.0DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lorenz von Bibra
Bishop Lorenz von Bibra (born 1459, died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMellrichstadt
Ordained BishopWürzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,430
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,495, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast