Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Antworter, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1479AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
19 Apr 1479AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
25 Apr 1479Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis in Palaestina
17 Mar 1499DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Antworter (VIAF: 252893121)
Bishop Georg Antworter O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 19.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 202
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast