Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jérôme von Reitzenstein, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Athyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1420¹Born
144121.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
16 Nov 147454.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany
16 Nov 147454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Athyra
18 Dec 147454.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Athyra
16 Jul 150383.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme von Reitzenstein (VIAF: 95672217)
Bishop Jérôme von Reitzenstein O. Cist. (born 1420, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bamberg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLangheim

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 199
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,536
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,300
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Nov 2018

Quantcast