Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Groß von Trockau

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Feb 1487SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
28 Mar 1487ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
15 Jul 1487Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
30 Mar 1501DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Groß von Trockau
Bishop Heinrich Groß von Trockau (died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast