Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Basurco y Herrera

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1705BornBuenos Aires
2 Apr 175751.8SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
23 May 175751.9ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
2 May 175953.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
5 Feb 176155.6DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Basurco y Herrera:
Bishop José Antonio Basurco y Herrera (born , died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,881

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015