Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nikola Bani (Ban)

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1736Born
14 Apr 175922.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 180064.0AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 Nov 180064.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
15 Apr 181578.9DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Nikola Bani (Ban)
Archbishop Nikola Bani (Ban) (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1800, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast