Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Bacher

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1726Born
14 Mar 175024.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 177953.7AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
19 Dec 177953.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
6 Jul 181387.3DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Bacher
Bishop Bartolomeo Bacher (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast