Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christophoro d’Authier de Sisgau, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1609Born
27 Feb 165141.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
26 Mar 165141.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
17 Sep 166758.4DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

MicroData Summary for Christophoro d’Authier de Sisgau
Bishop Christophoro d’Authier de Sisgau O.S.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 114, Number 693
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,651, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast