Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Arias Gallego

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Apr 1556AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
31 May 1556Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
22 Aug 1565AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
28 Apr 1575DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Arias Gallego
Bishop Gonzalo Arias Gallego (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJerez de los Caballeros, Diocese of Badajoz
Ordained BishopSan Martin Chapel, La Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceMurcia

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,479
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 202, and Page 154
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 66, Number 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,556, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast