Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Pérez y Oliván

Deceased

Bishop of Urgell, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
24 Apr 155656.3AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
14 Jun 155656.4Ordained BishopBishop of Urgell, Spain
23 Sep 156060.7DiedBishop of Urgell, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan García Pérez y Oliván
Bishop Juan García Pérez y Oliván (born 1500, died ) Bishop of Urgell

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopSan Martin Chapel, La Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceUrgell, Diocese of Urgell

  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 67, Number 383
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast