Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hernando de Aragón, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1498Born
1 Mar 152425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
21 May 153940.8AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
9 Nov 153941.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
29 Jun 157576.9DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Hernando de Aragón (VIAF: 52494434)
Archbishop Hernando de Aragón O. Cist. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopCisterian, Monastery, Veruela
Death PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 51, Number 270
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast