Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Gómez Sarmiento de Villandrando

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹BornRibadeo
4 Mar 152345.2AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
26 Oct 152446.8AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
3 Jul 152547.5AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
8 Jun 153456.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
18 Oct 153860.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 153860.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
28 Jan 154163.1AppointedAdministrator of Anagni, Italy
6 Apr 154163.3ResignedAdministrator of Anagni, Italy
13 Oct 154163.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Gómez Sarmiento de Villandrando:
Cardinal Pedro Gómez Sarmiento de Villandrando (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Oct 1538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 266
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 35, Number 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013